ST JUDES COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY OPERATES A DROP-IN PROJECT FOR THE HOMELESS AND OTHER VULNERABLE PEOPLE OF THE KETTERING AREA. IT ALSO OPERATES THE KETTERING FOOBANK PROJECT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

1 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 07 June 2013: CIO registration
- ST JUDES COMMUNITY DROP-IN & KETTERING FOODBANK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DAVE GODDARD | Chair | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.76k | £16.80k | £13.83k | £18.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.66k | £15.27k | £15.89k | £13.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN KETTERING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Judes Court
Kettering
NN15 7JH
- Phone:
- 01536415495
- Email:
- stjudeskettering@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window