Financial history THURNBY SCOUTS

Charity number: 503393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £14.37k £14.24k £9.65k £152.03k £21.80k
Total expenditure £20.39k £7.75k £9.72k £139.61k £38.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £120.86k £5.00k