Financial history P21 GALLERY

Charity number: 1153141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £81.05k £91.66k £60.19k £33.13k £113.80k
Total expenditure £61.27k £56.57k £96.71k £48.90k £97.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £56.10k £21.90k N/A N/A