P21 GALLERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The P21 Gallery is an independent London-based charitable trust established to promote contemporary Arab art and culture. The facilities at P21 are planned to maximise the potential of contemporary art as a discourse, through multimedia exhibition spaces with supporting facilities for public functions in addition to workshops for training and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anas Ahmad | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR Ibrahim Darwish | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.05k | £91.66k | £60.19k | £33.13k | £113.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.27k | £56.57k | £96.71k | £48.90k | £97.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £56.10k | £21.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 October 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 October 2021 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: • TO WORK IN COLLABORATION WITH BRITISH AND INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, ORGANISATIONS, ARTISTS, CURATORS AND DESIGNERS TO PROMOTE, DOCUMENT AND FACILITATE PUBLIC ACCESS TO ARAB ART AND CULTURE IN BRITAIN BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ART GALLERY AND CULTURAL CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; • TO SUPPORT, DEVELOP AND ENCOURAGE AWARENESS OF ARAB ART AND CULTURE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ARAB ART AND CULTURE; AND • TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
P21 Gallery
21-27 Chalton Street
LONDON
NW1 1JD
- Phone:
- 02071216190
- Email:
- info@p21.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window