YOUTH LEGAL AND RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? Provided independent legal advice, and representation to young people living, studying or working in Wandsworth in Housing and Community Care law. ? Provided telephone advice to members of the public and2nd tier advice agencies and guidance and support to first tier advice workers. ? Carried out development, out-reach and training work. ? Sought funding for youth centred services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £67,616 from 1 government contract(s) and £23,625 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 March 2013: CIO registration
- YOUTH LEGAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heidi Dorophy Chloe Hubert | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Fordjour | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Ukaigwe | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Baskerville MA JP CBE | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Judith Vallely | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chiara Atie | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Potez | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.95k | £220.90k | £282.93k | £230.97k | £280.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.65k | £170.88k | £265.40k | £260.00k | £301.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £46.66k | £54.05k | £111.15k | £51.68k | £67.62k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £179.29k | £23.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 04 Mar 2013
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF LEGAL ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION TO YOUNG PERSONS, CHILDREN OR THEIR FAMILIES WHO LIVE, STUDY OR WORK WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH, MERTON, AND WITHIN SUCH OTHER BOROUGHS IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS LIVING, STUDYING OR WORKING WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH, MERTON, AND WITHIN SUCH OTHER BOROUGHS IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; (3) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH, MERTON, AND WITHIN SUCH OTHER BOROUGHS IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Youth Legal and Resource Centre
Devas Club
2a Stormont Road
LONDON
SW11 5EN
- Phone:
- 02031951906
- Email:
- info@youthlegal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window