BANGLADESH INT. RECOVERY DEVELOPMENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bangladesh Int. Recovery Developments works for education of the street children around the world. The main operating zone is Bangladesh. BIRD also works for women empowerment by providing them education & training in the developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bangladesh
- India
Governance
- 10 January 2013: Standard registration
- CHARITY BIRD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MD KAISAR AL ISLAM | Chair | 04 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tasnia Noor Salim | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHELSEA VICTORIA NEEDHAM | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/12/2017 | 03/12/2018 | 03/12/2019 | 03/12/2020 | 03/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195 | £1.46k | £4.43k | £4.87k | £4.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195 | £1.46k | £4.43k | £4.87k | £4.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days | |
Annual return | 03 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 604 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 604 days | |
Annual return | 03 December 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 December 2020 | 12 February 2022 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED ON 09/01/2013
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ORPHANS, STREET CHILDREN AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES, PRIMARILY LIVING IN BANGLADESH AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, BY PROVIDING GOODS AND SERVICES. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ORPHANS, STREET CHILDREN AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN, PRIMARILY LIVING IN BANGLADESH AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES SET FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Greta Terrace
SUNDERLAND
SR4 7RD
- Phone:
- 07766979299
- Email:
- info@charitybird.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window