THE ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL GENOMIC SCIENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion, encouragement and advancement of the study and practice of clinical genomic science. The advancement of education, research and innovation in clinical genomic science. The development and promotion of clinical standards in clinical genomic science.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 September 2013: Standard registration
- 23 April 2014: Funds received from 1078518 CLINICAL MOLECULAR GENETICS SOCIETY
- ACGS (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL GENETIC SCIENCE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Short | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Ramsden | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.59k | £17.91k | £25.26k | £85.99k | £70.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.84k | £39.92k | £20.56k | £58.76k | £66.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED ON 04 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH, BY ANY MEANS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING BY: - THE PROMOTION, ENCOURAGEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CLINICAL GENETIC SCIENCE; - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND INNOVATION IN CLINICAL GENETIC SCIENCE; AND - THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROMOTION OF CLINICAL STANDARDS IN CLINICIAL GENETIC SCEINECE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St George's Genomics Service
ST. GEORGES HOSPITAL MEDICAL SCHOOL
CRANMER TERRACE
LONDON
SW17 0RE
- Phone:
- 02087255332
- Email:
- john.short5@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window