HELLENIC HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to relieve the needs of children in Greece from deprived socio-economic backgrounds, in particular the prevention or relief of poverty and the promotion and protection of physical and mental health and education of such children, by providing grants, items and services to charities, or other organisations working to relieve such needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greece
Governance
- 25 January 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Panagiotis Vlachopoulos | Chair | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Bouras | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eirini Pantazi | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Georgios Konaris | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nikolaos Konstantinidis | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.75k | £148.04k | £218.01k | £221.75k | £40.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.64k | £164.66k | £269.24k | £284.00k | £75.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1574 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1574 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Jan 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN IN GREECE FROM DEPRIVED SOCIO-ECONOMIC BACKGROUNDS, IN PARTICULAR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE SUCH NEEDS.
Area of benefit
GREECE
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Clapham Common West Side
LONDON
SW4 9AZ
- Phone:
- +44 739 333 8977
- Email:
- info@hellenic-hope.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window