STOKE-ON-TRENT FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty in Stoke-on-Trent and the surrounding area by providing food to local people who are in need of emergency supplies and by such other means as the trustees determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £200,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 14 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lilian Jean Dodd | Chair | 28 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Mary Millward | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barry Douglas Lye | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Marie Mercer | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Poxon | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.85k | £475.81k | £284.43k | £484.30k | £378.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.73k | £228.81k | £187.04k | £336.97k | £366.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £71.13k | £85.80k | £126.55k | £200.00k | £200.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN STOKE-ON-TRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING FOOD TO LOCAL PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED OF EMERGENCY SUPPLIES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stoke-On-Trent Food Bank
Magdalen Road
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST3 3HS
- Phone:
- 07496564436
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window