NORTH EAST WELLBEING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
North East Wellbeing works to maintain a community of practitioners delivering wellbeing services to partnerships of schools. We work in the North East of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 2013: Standard registration
- DWT (Working name)
- DARLINGTON WELLBEING TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS JOHN BLACKBURN | Chair | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ryan | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McTimoney | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Brown | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Davidson | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.92k | £183.41k | £303.49k | £393.94k | £298.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.10k | £175.67k | £255.92k | £367.18k | £305.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £250 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE ONLY OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING AND ENHANCING THE EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT LEVELS AND PERFORMANCE, PROSPECTS, EMOTIONAL WELLBEING AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS AND/OR ILL HEALTH IN THE SCHOOL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39a Hencotes
Hexham
NE46 2EW
- Phone:
- 01434601494
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window