ALTON CHRISTIAN CARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary purpose is to operate Alton Foodbank, the main focus is on the collection and distribution of food in accordance with the rules and recommendations set out by the Trussell Trust who are the over arching sponsors of some 400 foodbanks throughout the UK. A secondary object is the operation of a school uniform bank for local primary schools in the immediate area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 April 2013: Standard registration
- ALTON FOOD BANK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Martin Dane | Chair | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Fletcher | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hinson | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Matthews | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
THELMA MARGARET THOMAS | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deidre Weideman | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH BARBARA DUNCAN | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KENNETH SUSANS | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.21k | £175.56k | £97.38k | £163.74k | £171.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.65k | £108.15k | £91.97k | £149.39k | £177.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.62k | £14.95k | £6.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/02/2013 as amended on 21 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS IN ALTON, HAMPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN A CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (BENEFICIARIES) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:A)SUPPLYING FREE FOOD PARCELS AND OTHER GOODS EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH AGENCY PARTNERS APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES B)SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF THE BENEFICIARIES 2.TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. TO CONTRIBUTE BY WAY OF GRANTS TO OTHER LOCAL ORGANISATIONS DEALING WITH HARDSHIP AMONGST INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN THE LOCAL AREA PROVIDED THAT SUCH GRANTS ARE NOT MADE FROM MONIES RECEIVED FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF FOOD IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS THE CHARITY WILL CARRY THESE OUT IN THE SPIRIT OF CHRISTIAN COMPASSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alton Foodbank
15 Market Square
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 1HD
- Phone:
- 07773034447
- Email:
- info@alton.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window