WIGAN ROAD EDUCATION AND COMMUNTY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide educational and prayer facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 07 January 2014: Standard registration
- WRECC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EBRAHIM KHAN | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZAKIR HUSEIN SHAIKH | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
YUNUS MUSA | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.12k | £167.41k | £310.26k | £155.62k | £108.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.83k | £17.49k | £11.98k | £14.92k | £31.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 November 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 November 2024 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/12/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 4. TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITH GROUPS AND BACKGROUNDS, WITH A FOCUS ON HARMONY BETWEEN PEOPLE PROFESSING THE MUSLIM FAITH AND ALL OTHER INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA, PARTICULARLY BY SUPPORTING INTERFAITH PROJECTS AND ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO LEARN ABOUT ISLAM THESE OBJECTS ARE PARTICULARLY THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF, AND VISITORS TO, THE AREA OF BOLTON (“AREA OF BENEFIT”)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masjid Ali
396-398 Wigan Road
BOLTON
BL3 4QH
- Phone:
- 07970925449
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window