K9 Rescue

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities: offering shelter or sanctuary for animals which are in need of medical attention; providing medical treatment for animals; actively seeking new homes for "rescued" animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bulgaria
- Macedonia
- Ukraine
Governance
- 04 June 2013: Standard registration
- K9 Rescue International (Working name)
- K9-RESCUE LTD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE JONES | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DARREN MOXEY | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JONES | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.58k | £20.65k | £27.69k | £33.52k | £43.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.80k | £21.59k | £29.37k | £28.67k | £48.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 January 2022 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 APR 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/05/2013 as amended on 21 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS." "TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS." ACTIVITIES: OFFERING SHELTER OR SANCTUARY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF MEDICAL ATTENTION; PROVIDING MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR ANIMALS; ACTIVELY SEEKING NEW HOMES FOR "RESCUED" ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-75 SHELTON STREET
COVENT GARDEN
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 0203 866 1229
- Email:
- brian@k9-rescue.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window