THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEADLEY WITH BOX HILL

Charity number: 1151029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings. Outreach to all villagers by providing a care team and a meeting point for carers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £112,531
Total expenditure: £111,120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 2013: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HEADLEY WITH BOX HILL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Anthony Donnelly Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Georgette Lucia Mimicopoulou Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Celia Frances Toms Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Sally Vivien Hunt Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Susan Jane Boswell Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Thelma Rose Ann Jackson Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Ann Marie Golding Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Philip John Hollingdale Trustee 10 May 2022
MARY FREEMAN BRAITHWAITE BEQUEST
Received: On time
ST ANDREWS BRODIE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Henry Nicholas Lomax Latham Trustee 01 September 2017
WALTON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
ST ANDREWS BRODIE TRUST
Received: On time
Roger John Kitley Trustee 10 April 2016
ST ANDREWS BRODIE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £284.67k £242.09k £135.73k £135.10k £112.53k
Total expenditure £128.38k £475.53k £157.49k £128.96k £111.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE RECTORY
BREECH LANE
WALTON ON THE HILL
TADWORTH
KT20 7SD
Phone:
07785990229