TAG: THE PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LECTURERS IN YOUTH AND COMMUNITY WORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TAG: The Professional Association of Lecturers in Youth and Community Work represents the interests of academics, educators and researchers in the field of youth and community work. It exists to promote research. education and training in youth and community work in higher education for the public benefit through connecting our membership through conferences, events and sector activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 December 2015: Standard registration
- TAG PALYCW (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Rouncefield | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pam Alldred | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jess Achilleos | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracie Trimmer-Platman | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.01k | £38.65k | £35.20k | £17.08k | £29.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.36k | £23.28k | £21.16k | £23.26k | £41.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 APR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN YOUTH AND COMMUNITY WORK IN HIGHER EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO 1. DRAW ON AND EXTEND CURRENT THINKING AND PRACTICE IN RELATION TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING, SKILLS AND ABILITIES, AND PERSONAL VALUES AND COMMITMENT IN YOUTH AND COMMUNITY WORK TO 2. IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF PROFESSIONAL YOUTH AND COMMUNITY WORK EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO 3. SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUTH WORKERS TO ENABLE THEM TO PROVIDE QUALITY YOUTH AND COMMUNITY WORK TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES TO 4. FACILITATE AND SUPPORT THE EDUCATION, DEVELOPMENT AND FLOURISHING OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BG Futures
Bishop Grosseteste University
Longdales Road
Lincoln
LN1 3DY
- Phone:
- 01522404403
- Email:
- info@tagpalycw.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window