LYMM FESTIVAL

Charity Number: 1154232
Charity reporting is up to date (101 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity works to advance the arts for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of an arts festival and workshops in Lymm, Cheshire. The charity also works to advance the education of the public in the heritage of Lymm.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £40,854
Total expenditure: £39,120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Warrington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN GEORGE MARKS Chair 01 November 2024
None on record
Christine Hamlin Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Carol Mary Devine Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Adrian James Bull Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Ann Dobson Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £50.88k £4.02k £14.99k £38.07k £40.85k
Total expenditure £49.35k £6.85k £6.59k £40.02k £39.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k £500

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 October 2024 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 October 2024 101 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 January 2024 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 January 2024 191 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
39 Mill Lane
LYMM
Cheshire
WA13 9SD
Phone:
07823 324342