INPUT PATIENT ADVOCACY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide advocacy services to people living with or affected by diabetes to support their access to diabetes technology including insulin pumps and continuous glucose monitoring, via a website, email and telephone support, attending and exhibiting at relevant events, engagement with agencies such as the National Institute for Health & Care Excellence, informing parliament via APPGs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 2013: Standard registration
- 11 July 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 11 July 2019: Funds transferred to 295716 JUVENILE DIABETES RESEARCH FOUNDATION LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.20k | £26.75k | £20.98k | £20.72k | £25.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.17k | £26.52k | £18.30k | £27.60k | £22.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 19 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 19 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 19 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 17 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE EFFECTIVE TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF TYPE 1 AND TYPE 2 DIABETES, BY THE PROVISION OF ON-LINE RESOURCES, THE PUBLICATION OF OTHER PUBLICATIONS, AND THROUGH MEETINGS AND CONFERENCES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window