Accounts and annual returns LIVING PRAISE TABERNACLE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1150376
Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 19 December 2023 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 22 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 April 2022 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 22 April 2022 569 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required