SEDGEFIELD OUT OF SCHOOL FUN CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fun club is based within the grounds of Sedgefield Primary and operates from their own purpose built premises. Fun club provides high quality reliable childcare at a reasonable cost for children aged 3-14 years before & after school and during school holidays. The club provides a range of indoor and outdoor activities for the children to participate in during their time at the club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £3,330 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Durham
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 29 April 2013: Standard registration
- 11 May 2017: Funds received from 1041230 SEDGEFIELD OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS FUN CLUB
- SOSFC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Mason | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross McPhie | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bell | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
DUDLEY JOHN WATERS | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|||||
ANDREA COX | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ALLISON USHER | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA HARDY | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.55k | £110.54k | £107.44k | £109.53k | £126.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.02k | £114.75k | £114.79k | £114.91k | £126.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.18k | £3.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/05/1995
Charitable objects
A)TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND; B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sedgefield Out of School Fun Club
Rectory Row
Sedgefield
Stockton-on-Tees
TS21 2BJ
- Phone:
- 01740623565
- Email:
- sosfc95@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window