HEAVEN GATE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Homework club Tennis activities Get together for sharing christian principles Food bank Get together for integration and breaking cultural barriers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 09 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALEY DAYA | Chair | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Bahati Lumbu | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA KAYAYA KOKONGANDO | Trustee | 23 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEAN NKIESE | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.06k | £117.88k | £107.60k | £94.75k | £64.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.36k | £77.29k | £138.42k | £75.62k | £64.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/01/2013 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE FOLLOWING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE OF AFRICAN ORIGIN)OR ARE ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; 3. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; 4. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Lower Tower Street
BIRMINGHAM
B19 3NH
- Phone:
- 01213597006
- Email:
- heavengatecentre@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window