Financial history LONGNEWTON AND ELTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503412
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £2.62k £1.68k £3.69k £2.14k £1.77k
Total expenditure £1.87k £918 £667 £644 £698
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A