Financial history THE ISLAMIC CULTURE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1152331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £21.00k £16.34k £7.16k £8.39k £8.81k
Total expenditure £10.54k £5.99k £7.07k £7.21k £6.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.01k £10.24k N/A N/A N/A