THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARYS CHURCH WOOTTON BEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
Governance
- 14 February 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARYS CHURCH WOOTTON BEDS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Revd Canon Peter Michael Ackroyd | Chair | 08 January 2013 |
|
|||||||
Annette Hart | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
ALISON REED-THOMSETT | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Katharine Wilson | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Charlie Bellwood | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jean-Michel Rodrigues | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Sullivan | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jinghua Yang | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Brice | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Allyson Cable | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Robert Hearn | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
TIMOTHY JAMES DILLSTONE | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
James Hignett | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
PAULINE YVONNE KENDALL | Trustee | 08 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
HAZEL CATHERINE SANDERS | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.68k | £161.06k | £148.79k | £159.75k | £151.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.13k | £151.29k | £147.39k | £147.06k | £159.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
CHURCH ROAD
WOOTTON
BEDFORD
MK43 9HF
- Phone:
- 01234768391
- Email:
- office@stmaryswootton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window