THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY HORNSEY RISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of Worship; Community Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 14 February 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY HORNSEY RISE ISLINGTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TAMSIN LAETITIA RACHEL MERCHANT BA | Chair | 08 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Carole Sammy | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Skilling | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Mansi | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Ian Merchant | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Jorge Jesus Santos de Barros Mr | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Cusumano | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Barnes | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Clarke | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Tina Bennett | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Pickard | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna James | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.37k | £273.40k | £238.91k | £155.79k | £223.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.07k | £150.71k | £247.75k | £191.76k | £217.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.22k | £10.18k | £14.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church
Ashley Road
LONDON
N19 3AD
- Phone:
- 02079162710
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window