Financial history JOSEPH'S GOAL

Charity number: 1151548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £132.44k £96.64k £125.41k £143.56k £109.48k
Total expenditure £144.12k £106.91k £111.37k £156.32k £111.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A