Accounts and annual returns ALIF ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1151898
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 22 April 2016 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 22 April 2016 174 days late
Annual return 31 December 2013 30 December 2014 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 30 December 2014 60 days late