KENDAL BRIDGE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playing brdge and encouraging the development of bridge playing in the Kendal area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 13 March 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Peill | Chair | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth John Orford | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Harris | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Mitchell | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Martin Harrison | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Wilkinson | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Richard Harry Brazier | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.86k | £9.41k | £23.37k | £17.27k | £16.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.14k | £8.31k | £18.29k | £15.69k | £14.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Mar 2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE GAME OF BRIDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF KENDAL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; (2)THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING, TEACHING AND PLAYING OF BRIDGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF KENDAL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbot Hall Social Centre
Dowkers Lane
KENDAL
Cumbria
LA9 4DN
- Phone:
- 01539 295064
- Email:
- harrison.tandj@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window