RESTORE SUPPORT NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peer befriending and support for older people leaving prison with a focus on meeting their care and resettlement needs together with signposting to other appropriate adult services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2013: Standard registration
- 17 February 2017: Funds received from 1082827 TECHNOLOGY FOR NEED TRUST
- 21 December 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.50k | £39.17k | £29.75k | £30.15k | £18.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.96k | £37.05k | £32.84k | £30.46k | £17.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 10 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 10 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/07/2011
Charitable objects
OBJECTS 4 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING: (A.) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO EX-OFFENDERS TO TRANSITION, REHABILITATE AND INTEGRATE THEM INTO SOCIETY DURING THE PERIOD PRIOR TO AND FOLLOWING THEIR RELEASE FROM PRISON AND TO SEEK TO REDUCE THE RISK OF SUCH EX-OFFENDERS RE-OFFENDING FOLLOWING THEIR RELEASE FROM PRISON, IN PARTICULAR BY ENGAGING IN SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OBJECTS, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION), ANY OF THE FOLLOWING: (1) PROVIDING LOCAL NETWORK GROUPS OF OTHER EX-OFFENDERS, VOLUNTEER AND/OR SUPPORT OFFICERS TO ENCOURAGE AND ENABLE EX-OFFENDERS TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY IN THE COMMUNITY; (2) PROVIDING MENTORING, COUNSELING, EDUCATION AND/OR TRAINING, OR FACILITATING ACCESS TO MENTORING, COUNSELING, EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROVIDED BY THIRD PARTY GROUPS OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS; (3) INCREASING OR CO-ORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR EX-OFFENDERS TO ENGAGE WITH THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN WHICH THEY LIVE; (4) PROVIDING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; (5) PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS AND GENERAL SUPPORT, ADVICE AND COUNSELING; (6) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE EX-OFFENDERS TO MAXIMISE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY AND OBTAIN GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT OR ENGAGE IN VOLUNTEER PROGRAMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY; (7) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING EX-OFFENDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHILST SERVING CUSTODIAL SENTENCES AND FOLLOWING THEIR RELEASE FROM PRISON AND/OR PREPARING ANALYSIS AND REPORTS AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION TO THE MEDIA, DECISION MAKERS, GOVERNMENTAL BODIES, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, PRISON AND PROBATION SERVICE PROVIDERS, THE POLICE, PROVIDERS OF SERVICES AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC REGARDING SUCH MATTERS; AND/OR (8) CO-ORDINATING AND CO-OPERATING WITH ONE OR MORE OF THE PRISON SERVICE, PROBATION SERVICE, POLICE, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, PRISON AND PROBATION SERVICE, PROVIDERS OF SERVICES, CHARITABLE OR VOLUNTEER ORGANISATIONS OR BODIES, THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND SUCH OTHER PERSON, ENTITIES OR ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE PURSUANCE OF THE OBJECTS. (B.) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILL OF EX-OFFENDERS AS THE TRUSTEES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY FOLLOWING THEIR RELEASE FROM PRISON. (C.) THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP, NEED OR SUFFERING BY EX-OFFENDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, LACK OF EDUCATION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. (D.) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST EX-OFFENDERS FOLLOWING THEIR RELEASE FROM PRISON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING: (1) ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; (2) ASSISTANCE TO FIND TRAINING OR APPRENTICESHIPS OR FURTHER VOCATIONAL OR NONVOCATIONAL SKILLS OR TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES; (3) ASSISTANCE TO FIND OPPORTUNITIES FOR EX-OFFENDERS TO VOLUNTEER TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO GOVERNMENTAL, LOCAL AUTHORITY, CHARITABLE AND/OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS; (4) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFORMATION, MENTORING AND SUPPORT TO MAXIMISE OPPORTUNITIES FOR EX-OFFENDERS TO OBTAIN GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT OR ENGAGE IN VOLUNTEER PROGRAMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window