YOU CAN MAKE A DIFFERENCE

Charity number: 1150639
Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. Supporting the improvement of the learning environment at the following school: - Mukundagiri Primary School, Madhrantakam, Tamil Nadu, India 1. We have employed two school teachers to support the teaching of English and ICT. 2. Provided school infrastruction - desks, chairs, learning aids, books for library, 4 desktop computers, printers and broadband connection.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017

Total income: £750
Total expenditure: £700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Harrow
  • Hillingdon
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MADF (Working name)
  • MAKE A DIFFERENCE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
  • YOU CAN MAKE A DIFFERENCE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SRIDHAR AIYANGAR Chair 09 January 2013
None on record
ERROL D'LIMA Trustee 23 January 2013
None on record
RICHARD CHENGA-REDDY Trustee 23 January 2013
None on record
VIJAYADHARINI AIYANGAR Trustee 09 January 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £12.01k £12.19k £1.00k £250 £750
Total expenditure £8.82k £14.25k £1.10k £150 £700
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
94 Deane Croft Road
Pinner
HA5 1SP
Phone:
No information available