Financial history THATCHAM RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1151545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £72.26k £73.15k £65.52k £61.89k £76.76k
Total expenditure £49.42k £43.82k £82.30k £62.58k £56.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.05k £2.67k N/A N/A