THATCHAM RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing recreational opportunities for the Thatcham area and surrounding villages through the playing of Rugby football. Offering activity to all age groups from U6 to U16, colts and 3 senior sides. We also offer a none contact version of the game and are currently a O2 touch hub for the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 05 April 2013: CIO registration
- TRFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hamilton | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jack Moore | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Langford | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Smith | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Keith Adamson | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew John Thorogood | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Dixon | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK LITTLECHILD | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.26k | £73.15k | £65.52k | £61.89k | £76.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.42k | £43.82k | £82.30k | £62.58k | £56.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.05k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THATCHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THATCHAME AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Shakespeare Road
THATCHAM
Berkshire
RG18 3FQ
- Phone:
- 07920015199
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window