Financial history SHEEPFOLD - UK

Charity number: 1153614
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.70k £89.59k £56.92k £111.47k £195.58k
Total expenditure £80.40k £68.58k £72.59k £102.92k £209.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A