Financial history ALSAGER ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1150586
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/03/2020 21/03/2021 21/03/2022 21/03/2023 21/03/2024
Total gross income £23.12k £20.27k £48.08k £63.70k £58.73k
Total expenditure £25.17k £15.57k £41.76k £49.50k £63.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.75k £4.00k £18.50k £13.00k £14.20k