6TH MORLEY (CHURWELL) SCOUT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various indoor/outdoor activities including sports, team games and the opportunity to learn different skills within the scout movement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 June 1974: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 March 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 September 2011: Re-registered
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 2ND MORLEY (EAST ARDSLEY) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £5.03k | £5.27k | £6.45k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £4.56k | £5.67k | £2.74k | £2.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 19 July 2012 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 09 September 2011 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DESCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window