ART IN ROMNEY MARSH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our overall aim is: to advance the education of the public in Romney Marsh and the surrounding area through learning opportunities, workshops, exhibitions, performances and other educational events. We aim to provide an educational programme that uses imaginative and fun approaches to engage excluded and hard to reach groups in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 10 May 2013: CIO registration
- AIRM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Waite | Chair | 21 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Indiana Hamilton-Brown | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Macbeth | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE KAY | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.04k | £16.00k | £52.66k | £49.70k | £46.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.68k | £12.40k | £35.09k | £40.00k | £59.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 May 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ROMNEY MARSH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE CONTEMPORARY VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, PERFORMANCES, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tower House
Newchurch Lane
Ivychurch
ROMNEY MARSH
Kent
TN29 0AX
- Phone:
- 07595540584
- Email:
- artinromneymarsh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window