Accounts and annual returns THE TRURO FENCING CLUB TALENT TRUST

Charity number: 1150950
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 February 2020 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 June 2018 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 25 April 2017 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required