FRIENDS OF LOWTHER PAVILION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Lowther Pavilion hold many events during the year including dances, coffee mornings and a variety of entertainment, all of which raise money for the refurbishment of the theatre. We also provide Front of House helpers for all the professional and amateur shows which again saves the theatre the cost of paid staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
340 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 April 2013: Standard registration
- FOLP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB GEMMELL | Chair | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Philip Allen | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Newman | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Kirkby | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Zeall | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN FELL | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ROWE | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SAULT | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE O'HARA | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIET LAWRENCE | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD DAVIS | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARGARET MERCER | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.82k | £6.35k | £17.06k | £23.51k | £29.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.22k | £7.07k | £11.67k | £18.59k | £36.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2013 as amended on 24 Aug 2021 as amended on 24 Aug 2021 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE LOWTHER GARDENS, LYTHAM, REGISTERED CHARITY 1117054, BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT IN PARTICULAR OF THE LOWTHER PAVILION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Central Drive
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
Lancashire
FY8 4DF
- Phone:
- 07754796855
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window