CHAR BHANJYANG TAMU SAMAJ U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds taking part on Great South Run, organising Charity dinner night and any donation received from the donors. It is a general charity which mainly support in the field of Health and education in the remote foot hills of Nepal. Detail audit report is submitted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2013: Standard registration
- CBTSUK (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madan Prasad GURUNG | Chair | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Gurung | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chandra Bahadur Gurung | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
HARI GURUNG | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEN KUMAR | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GYAM BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|||||
KUSANG GURUNG | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.94k | £8.08k | £9.04k | £23.97k | £12.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.37k | £16.76k | £9.49k | £6.07k | £18.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 23/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:(A)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP;(B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION;(C)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH;(D)THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED,RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY,OR PARTS OF SOCIETY,AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS:UNEMPLOYMENT;FINANCIAL HARDSHIP;YOUTH OR OLD AGE;ILL HEALTH(PHYSICAL OR MENTAL);SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS;DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX,RACE,DISABILITY,ETHNIC ORIGIN,RELIGION,BELIEF,CREED,SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT;POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT;RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN;POOR HOUSING(THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS;CRIME(EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).(E)THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:(FOR EXAMPLE)·PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS;·ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS;·WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE.(F)TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY:·THE PRESERVATION,CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES;·THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES;·THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION.SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS“DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.”;(G)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY(OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE)FOR PERSONS,BODIES,ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 The Larches
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB10 0DN
- Phone:
- 02082398491
- Email:
- admin@charbhanjyang.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window