HAMPERS OF HOPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian charity with the purpose of relieving poverty, presently focused in North-East Cheshire. Our activities include providing Christmas food hampers for those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 07 June 2013: Standard registration
- 09 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 09 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1183290 HOPE CENTRAL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.68k | £118.33k | £92.18k | £82.42k | £45.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.54k | £108.28k | £89.43k | £87.96k | £52.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 27 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 27 December 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES 4. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, AND 5. THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window