THE JANE HENDERSON FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disaster Relief from Shelter to Settlement
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
- France
- Haiti
- Indonesia
- Philippines
- Vanuatu
Governance
- 05 April 2013: Standard registration
- 12 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BYOND (Working name)
- BYOND (Previous name)
- SHELTER FOR HUMANITY (Previous name)
- SHELTER FOR HUMANITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.27k | £7.93k | £7.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.34k | £14.22k | £14.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 March 2017 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/03/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF SHELTER AND LINKED BASIC SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window