OLD ENGLISH SHEEPDOG RESCUE & WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide care and treatment for unwanted Old English Sheepdogs and rehome to appropriate homes. Provide information and assistance to the public and other rescues and organisations on all matters relating to Old English Sheepdogs. Provide public information leaflets for rescue OES and for safety and child safety around all dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2013: Standard registration
- OES RESCUE & WELFARE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY SIMPSON | Chair | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM LOVE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LOVE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH NOBLE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.30k | £18.64k | £22.70k | £21.84k | £11.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.25k | £7.60k | £9.26k | £5.69k | £5.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE BREED KNOWN AS OLD ENGLISH SHEEPDOGS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO DOG WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONGST DOGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Longwall House
Main Street
Farthingstone
Towcester
NN12 8EZ
- Phone:
- 01327360908
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window