THE ANSAR TRUST WORLDWIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING HEALTHCARE, EDUCATION, GRANTS AND TRAINING IN CRISIS AND NON CRISIS SITUATIONS IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, RELIGION, CULTURE, CREED AND GEOGRAPHICAL BOUNDARY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Jordan
Governance
- 14 March 2013: Standard registration
- 25 April 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- MEDICINES RELIEF (Working name)
- THE INSPIRE PROJECT (Working name)
- THE ANSAR TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.81k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.47k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 April 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 April 2022 | 444 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2013
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR OTHER CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY BY OFFERING HEALTHCARE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN CRISIS AND NON CRISIS SITUATIONS IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, RELIGION, CULTURE, CREED AND GEOGRAPHICAL BOUNDARY. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY BROADCASTING ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL MESSAGES OF A TEACHING NATURE TO THE PUBLIC TO ENLIGHTEN THEM ABOUT THE RELIGION OF ISLAM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window