Financial history SOUTH HOUSE SILVER WORKSHOP TRUST

Charity Number: 1151646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £768 £34.10k £2.11k £45.71k £34.77k
Total expenditure £1.97k £6.65k £19.41k £14.96k £45.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A