SOUTH HOUSE SILVER WORKSHOP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of vocational training in the fine and applied arts and crafts to persons who are in financial need and the assistance in the establishment of such persons as craftsmen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 April 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rod Kelly | Chair | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Chris Ellard | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Smith | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Grimstone | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £768 | £34.10k | £2.11k | £45.71k | £34.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.97k | £6.65k | £19.41k | £14.96k | £45.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN FINE AND APPLIED ARTS TO PERSONS WHO OTHERWISE WOULD NOT BE ABLE TO AFFORD SUCH TRAINING DUE TO LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South House
Muckle Roe
Brae
SHETLAND
ZE2 9QW
- Phone:
- 07777672471
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window