Financial history BARTON JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1152129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £32.74k £40.08k £24.49k £31.60k £43.03k
Total expenditure £22.96k £21.86k £39.53k £38.59k £41.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.00k £17.60k N/A N/A £4.98k