VETERANS IN COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Veterans in Communities is an ex-services charity based in East Lancashire. Established in September 2012, VIC supports ex-service personnel, their families and members of the uniformed services who have experienced difficulties re-integrating with the community on returning to civilian life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £100,968 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Rochdale
Governance
- 12 March 2013: Standard registration
- VIC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RONNIE BARKER | Chair | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robin Elliott | Trustee | 16 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Marilyn Winifred Anne Procter | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Alan James Woods | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Hyde | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Major Charles Robert Smethurst | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BARRY PAYTON MBE | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.37k | £188.71k | £212.43k | £247.61k | £176.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.77k | £199.43k | £187.76k | £224.81k | £218.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.82k | N/A | £500 | £123.75k | £100.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE NEED, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST VETERANS OF ALL BRANCHES OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR PARTNERS, SPOUSES AND DEPENDENT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A COMPREHENSIVE AND DIVERSE OUTREACH PROGRAMME DEVELOPED, DESIGNED AND DELIVERED BY VETERANS FOR VETERANS IN THE NORTH WEST WHICH SUPPORTS VETERANS SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF WAR AND HAVE FOUND THE TRANSITION FROM MILITARY TO CIVILIAN LIFE DIFFICULT AS A MEANS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH; SUPPORT THEIR RESETTLEMENT, REHABILITATION, IF NEEDED AND THEIR RETRAINING TO HELP THEM OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
VIC Centre
12 Bury Road
Haslingden
ROSSENDALE
Lancashire
BB4 5PL
- Phone:
- 01706833180
- Email:
- info@vic.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window