Governing document NORTHAMPTON CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity number: 1151112
Up to date
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 06 MAR 2013 AMENDED ON 11/06/2013 AMENDED ON 13/04/2014 AMENDED ON 14/12/2014 as amended on 02 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THIS CHURCH IS TO ACCOMPLISH THE MISSION OF CHRIST BY PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST, PROMOTING THE DOCTRINE OF CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND DEVELOPING BELIEVERS’ SPIRITUALITY.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.