DENTON WEST END COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a community library service, together with additonal facilities. Wholly owned and run by Community. To encourage, nuture and assist in the personal development of all members of the Community in 'learning' as a leisure activity. To improve the lives of the residents of Tameside, in a common effort to provide opportunities for social involvement and welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tameside
Governance
- 12 February 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN WILSON | Chair | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Carl Stephens | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lloyd-Walsh | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Joanne Scopes | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ingham | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matt Limbert | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Massey | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE THOMAS | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE BELSHAM | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
TRACY BREHENY | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Karen McLauchlan | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|||||
ALAN AVES | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.50k | £29.66k | £17.50k | £31.55k | £36.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.99k | £16.86k | £20.35k | £15.49k | £28.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 12 Feb 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. PROVIDING LIBRARY FACILITIES AND SERVICE; B PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES; C ASSISTING WITH EDUCATION; AND D. ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING EDUCATION, LEARNING AS A LEISURE ACTIVITY, AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TAMESIDE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS) BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT (BUT NOT OTHERWISE) THE CIO SHALL HAVE POWER (BUT NOT THE OBLIGATION) TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN THE BUILDING FORMERLY HOUSING DENTON WEST END COMMUNITY LIBRARY, AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE, DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF THAT FACILITY FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CIO IN FURTHERANCE OF ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Denton West End Community Library
West End Library
Windsor Road
Denton
MANCHESTER
M34 2HB
- Phone:
- 01613366225
- Email:
- dweclibrary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window