THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIPS, BIRCHENCLIFFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for various groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 25 January 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ST PHILIPS, BIRCHENCLIIFE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOANNE PATRICIA HUSTWICK | Chair | 20 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Ruth Bradley | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Alice Fort | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Smith | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Brooks | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN Dyson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lobb | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andre Brooks | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Smith | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Walter Anthony Pell | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MS VAL LORD | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN HAIGH | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER LLEWELLYN JONES | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY SHAW | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.78k | £71.79k | £57.04k | £75.48k | £81.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.75k | £48.03k | £59.75k | £57.12k | £89.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £585 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
115 BURN ROAD
HUDDERSFIELD
HD2 2EG
- Phone:
- 01422371746
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window