LOVE STREATHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of Love Streatham are organising events such as Action Days, Family Fun Day, recruiting volunteers for charity events and delivering local services, in order to provide relief for disadvantaged and needy residents in and around Streatham, promote social cohesion, and at the same time show God's love and advance the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,576 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Merton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 11 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Alex Lyell | Chair | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alexandra Claire Camp | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Hannah Tate | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Mark Craven Dowlen | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Akinwunmi Wasiu Ladapo | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.98k | £17.04k | £15.44k | £7.77k | £14.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.40k | £13.53k | £10.62k | £9.81k | £12.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Pendennis Road
LONDON
SW16 2SR
- Phone:
- 020 8677 5752
- Email:
- info@lovestreatham.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window